VA HB1229 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0431)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0431)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Excursion trains; certification requirements; liability of railroad company. Removes the requirement that a passenger train be operated primarily in Buchanan, Campbell, or Washington County in order to be certified as an excursion train. The bill further removes the requirement that a locality pass a resolution to immunize a railroad company upon which an excursion train operates from liability for personal injury or wrongful death arising from the operation of the excursion train.
Title
Excursion trains; certification requirements, liability of railroad company.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0431) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 431 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-08 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-08 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1229ER) |
2016-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE(99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16103584D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 2099.41 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2099.42 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |