VA HB1209 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1078)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1078)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Social Services; Office of New Americans created. Establishes the Office of New Americans within the Department of Social Services and the Office of New Americans Advisory Board to assist with immigrant integration within the Commonwealth on an economic, social, and cultural level. The Office shall provide (i) advice and assistance regarding the citizenship application process; (ii) assistance with securing employment, housing, and services for which such persons may be eligible; (iii) information to localities and immigration service organizations about state programs that help such persons find and secure employment, housing, and services for which they may be eligible; and (iv) information to localities and immigration service organizations regarding health epidemics and unlawful predatory actions, such as human trafficking, gang recruitment, and fraudulent financial and other schemes, to which communities of such persons may be especially vulnerable. The Advisory Board shall report annually to the Governor and the General Assembly on the activities of the Office of New Americans and provide recommendations for improving state policies and programs to support the economic, linguistic, and civic integration of new Americans throughout the Commonwealth.
Title
New Americans, Office of; created within Department of Social Services.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 16-N 1-A) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 41-N) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 16-N 1-A) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 41-N) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1078) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1078 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1209ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (54-Y 45-N) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 16-N 1-A) |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Tran, Keam, Avoli |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senators: Hashmi, Boysko, Cosgrove |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (24-Y 16-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108816D-S1 (0-Y 100-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1209S1 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108816D-S1 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108816D-S1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (56-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (56-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 20106907D-EH1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1209EH1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Amendment by Delegate Tran agreed to |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106907D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106907D-H1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (17-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105171D |
Same As/Similar To
SB991 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1079)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 209.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 209.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |