VA HB1209 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - House: Continued to 2013 in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - House: Continued to 2013 in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Real Estate Time-Share Act; developer control period. Provides that, except to the extent the time-share instruments expressly provide otherwise, the developer control period shall terminate when the developer (i) transfers to purchasers legal or equitable ownership of at least 90 percent of the time-share estates, excluding any reacquisition by the developer; (ii) is no longer the beneficiary on deeds of trust secured of at least 10 percent of the time-share estates; or (iii) has completed all of the promised common elements and facilities comprising the time-share estate project, whichever occurs later.
Title
Virginia Real Estate Time-Share Act; developer control period.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | House: Continued to 2013 in General Laws by voice vote | |
2012-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2012-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-19 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12103906D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB1209 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB1209+hil |