VA HB1204 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-28 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-28 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Investigation of alleged child abuse and neglect; agreements with school divisions. Requires local departments of social services and local school divisions to include, in written interagency agreements for the investigation of certain complaints of child abuse or neglect, provisions governing investigation of complaints of sexual abuse of a child in which coordination between the local department of social services and local school division is necessary to facilitate the investigation. In addition, the bill requires local school divisions to report annually to the Board of Education, and local departments of social services to report annually to the Board of Social Services, regarding the status of such interagency agreements for the investigation of complaints of child abuse and neglect against school personnel and reports of sexual abuse of children that require coordination between local departments and local school divisions to facilitate investigation of such complaints and reports.
Title
Investigation of alleged child abuse and neglect; agreements with school divisions.
Sponsors
Del. Joseph Yost [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB683-Herring) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-28 | House | Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB683-Herring) (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103817D |
Same As/Similar To
HB683 (Similar To) 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412)
Subjects
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Education
Minors
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Welfare (Social Services)
Education
Minors
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Welfare (Social Services)