VA HB1197 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Internet publication of personal information of law-enforcement officers; penalty. Provides that it is a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person to publish, sell, solicit, or trade on the Internet the personal information of any law-enforcement officer or his immediate family member knowing that he is a law-enforcement officer and with the intent to cause imminent bodily harm or the threat of imminent bodily harm to such individual.
Title
Law-enforcement officers; Internet publication of personal information, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1197H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105289D-H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105289D-H1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16103488D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 186.4:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 60.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |