VA HB1194 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - House: Continued to 2013 in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - House: Continued to 2013 in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Farm wineries and vineyards tax credit. Raises the total annual amount of tax credits available under the farm wineries and vineyards tax credit to $500,000 for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2012.
Title
Farm wineries and vineyards tax credit; raises credit beginning on or after January 1, 2012.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | House: Continued to 2013 in Finance by voice vote | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reconsidered by Finance | |
2012-02-08 | House: Tabled in Finance by voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #3 | |
2012-01-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-18 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12102490D |