VA HB1193 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Tech Talent Investment Program; eligibility for grant payments. Requires a public institution of higher education receiving grants via the Tech Talent Investment Program to agree to award 50 percent of its new eligible degrees for incoming freshman to students from rural areas. The bill defines "rural area" as a county or city with a population density of less than 200 persons per square mile.
Title
Tech Talent Investment Program; eligibility for grant payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Education |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103543D |