VA HB1191 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; construction management and design-build contracting; applicability. States that design-bid-build, defined in the bill, utilizing competitive sealed bidding is the preferred method of procurement for construction services in the Commonwealth. Complex projects, defined in the bill, may request an exemption from the provisions of the bill and relevant law from the Division of Engineering and Buildings of the Department of General Services. The bill requires all documents related to the proposed use of construction management or design-build by state public bodies and institutions of higher education and any available subcontractor opportunities to be posted on eVA. The bill transfers from the Department of General Services to the Division of Engineering and Buildings the authority to evaluate the proposed use of construction management or design-build by state public bodies and institutions of higher education and specifies that a local governing body must approve at a public meeting the use of construction management or design-build by a local public body. Finally, the bill prohibits state public bodies, institutions of higher education, and local governing bodies from considering prior construction management or design-build experience of contractors on comparable projects.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; construction management and design-build contracting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in General Laws |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Procurement/Open Government |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104340D |