VA HB1190 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1190
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-22 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-22 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle sales and use tax; definition of sale price. Excludes from the sale price for determining motor vehicle sales and use tax the amount of any credit given by the seller for any motor vehicle taken as a trade-in.
Title
Motor vehicle sales and use tax; definition of sale price.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-22 | House | Left in Finance |
2022-02-07 | House | Continued to 2023 in Finance by voice vote |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2023 by voice vote |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104294D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1190 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Continued to 2023 in Finance by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 2401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |