VA HB119 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Milk; definition; misbranding; prohibition. Defines "milk" as the lacteal secretion of a healthy hooved mammal and provides that a food product is unlawfully misbranded if its label states that it is milk and it fails to meet such definition, except for human breast milk. The bill directs the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services to implement a plan to ban all products misbranded as milk. The bill shall not become effective until six months after the enactment, on or before October 1, 2029, of a similar act in any 11 of 14 specified states.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Milk; definition, misbranding product, prohibition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Pending question, not ordered (16-Y 24-N) (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 32-N) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-04HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB119ER)
2020-03-04HouseEnrolled
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
2020-02-27SenatePending question, not ordered (16-Y 24-N)
2020-02-27SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N 1-A)
2020-02-18SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N)
2020-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-29HouseVOTE: Passage (66-Y 32-N)
2020-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House (66-Y 32-N)
2020-01-28HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB119H1
2020-01-28HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20105331D-H1
2020-01-28HouseRead second time
2020-01-27HousePassed by for the day
2020-01-24HouseRead first time
2020-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 20105331D-H1
2020-01-22HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
2020-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2019-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-12-16HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101914D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
325120(n/a)See Bill Text
325121(n/a)See Bill Text
325123(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB119&201+sum+HB119
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB119+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB119H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB119ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0101V0001+HB0119
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H01V0027+HB0119
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0180+HB0119
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0082+HB0119
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0413+HB0119
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1050HB0119+HB0119
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1172HB0119+HB0119
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1173HB0119+HB0119

Bill Comments

feedback