VA HB1186 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Attachments by cable television systems and telecommunications service providers to poles of electric cooperatives. Authorizes the State Corporation Commission to determine just and reasonable rates, and certain terms and conditions of service, for attachments to electric cooperative poles by telecommunications service providers and cable television systems. The authority may be exercised if, after good faith negotiations, the parties cannot reach an agreement regarding the attachment. Fees may be assessed to allow the Commission to recover appropriate costs of such proceedings.
Title
Telecommunications service provider or cable television system; rates for pole attachments.
Sponsors
Del. Barbara Comstock [R] | Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Del. Joe May [R] | Del. Donald Merricks [R] |
Del. Harry Purkey [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 545 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1186ER) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-13 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 2-A) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read third time and passed House (95-Y 0-N 2-A) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1186H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104810D-H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-07 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104810D-H1 | |
2012-02-07 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-18 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12103888D |
Same As/Similar To
SB652 (Same As) 2012-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674)