VA HB1178 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0162)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0162)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Labor and Industry; seizure first aid information. Directs the Department of Labor and Industry to disseminate information regarding seizure first aid, defined in the bill, to all employers and employees in the Commonwealth and requires all employers of 25 or more employees to physically post this information in a prominent location in the workplace. The bill incorporates the "Good Samaritan" provision of the Code of Virginia that shields a person from liability when rendering emergency care in good faith under certain circumstances. Department of Labor and Industry; seizure first aid information. Directs the Department of Labor and Industry to disseminate information regarding seizure first aid, defined in the bill, to all employers and employees in the Commonwealth and requires all employers of 25 or more employees to physically post this information in a prominent location in the workplace. The bill incorporates the "Good Samaritan" provision of the Code of Virginia that shields a person from liability when rendering emergency care in good faith under certain circumstances.
Title
Seizure first aid information; Department of Labor and Industry to disseminate information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0162) | |
2022-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 162 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1178ER) |
2022-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 22103796D-E |
2022-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1178E |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22103796D |