VA HB1176 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Sexual assault nurse examiners; place of practice. Requires every hospital to report quarterly to the Department of Health information regarding the number of certified sexual assault nurse examiners employed by the hospital and the location, including street address, and contact information for the location at which each certified sexual assault nurse examiner provides services. The bill also requires the Department of Health to make information regarding the availability of certified sexual assault nurse examiners in the Commonwealth, including the name of each hospital at which a certified sexual assault nurse examiner is employed, the location, including street address, of such hospital, and the contact information for such hospital, available on the Department's website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual assault nurse examiners; place of practice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1176ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-08SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-03-07HouseVOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N)
2020-03-07HouseConference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
2020-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05SenateSenators: Boysko, McClellan, Kiggans
2020-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-05HouseDelegates: Poindexter, Tran, Adams, D.M.
2020-03-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-05HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-03-05SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-03-05SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
2020-03-05HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 99-N)
2020-03-05SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-03-05SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-03-05SenateRead third time
2020-03-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-27SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-30HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N)
2020-01-30HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103533D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32123.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1176&201+sum+HB1176
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1176+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1176ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1201V0024+HB1176
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0083+HB1176
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0205V0059+HB1176
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0127+HB1176
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0180+HB1176
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0698+HB1176
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0360+HB1176
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0497+HB1176
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1529HB1176+HB1176
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1574HB1176+HB1176
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1929+HB1176
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1668HB1176+HB1176
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2043+HB1176
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1867HB1176+HB1176

Bill Comments

feedback