VA HB1174 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (4-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (4-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Electric energy consumption reduction goal; progress reports. Directs the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy, in consultation with the staff of the State Corporation Commission, to report annually, commencing no later than December 15, 2017, on the progress the Commonwealth is making toward meeting the goal adopted in 2007 of reducing the consumption of electric energy by retail customers by the year 2022 by an amount equal to 10 percent of the amount of electric energy consumed by retail customers in 2006. The reports are to be made to the General Assembly and the Governor's Executive Committee on Energy Efficiency or, if that Committee ceases operations, to the Governor.
Title
Electric energy; consumption reduction goal, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (4-Y 9-N) (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 11-N 1-A) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 11-N 1-A) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (4-Y 9-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 11-N 1-A) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House (85-Y 11-N 1-A) |
2016-02-15 | House | Printed as engrossed 16103848D-E |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1174E |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (20-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16103848D |