VA HB1165 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Richmond Metropolitan Authority; police. Provides that the Authority may exercise full law-enforcement powers upon all property owned, operated, managed, leased, or maintained by or under the control of the Authority; establish and maintain a police department; and appoint and employ police officers to enforce the laws of the Commonwealth, the ordinances of the City of Richmond or the County of Chesterfield or Henrico, whichever may be applicable, and all rules and regulations of the Authority.
Title
Richmond Metropolitan Authority; may establish and maintain police department, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2012-02-10 | House | Continued to 2013 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2012-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2012-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 12105350D-H1 |
2012-02-10 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 1-N) |
2012-02-10 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2012-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 1-N) |
2012-02-08 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2012-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2012-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 12103224D |