VA HB1153 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax assessments; appeal to court. Permits courts to grant reasonable attorney fees to taxpayers who prevail in appeals of real property tax assessments on residential property.
Title
Real property tax; assessments, appeal to court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-02-07 | House | Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2014-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2014-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103805D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1153 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1153+hil |