VA HB1152 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sales and use tax; agricultural exemptions. Provides a sales and use tax exemption for structural construction materials and environmental control systems to be affixed or integrated into a commercial greenhouse structure, so long as such materials and equipment have been specially ordered to meet the specifications of the commercial greenhouse operator. The bill applies to purchases of such materials and equipment made on or after July 1, 2020.
Title
Sales and use tax; agricultural exemptions.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Finance |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22103515D |