VA HB1152 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Threat assessment teams; criminal history and juvenile records. Authorizes threat assessment teams established by private nonprofit institutions of higher education to receive health and criminal history records of students for the purposes of assessment and intervention.
Title
Threat assessment teams; authorized to receive health and criminal history records of students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386) | |
2012-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 386 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1152ER) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #5 Mental Health | |
2012-01-16 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-16 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12104005D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 127.1:03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |