VA HB1106 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Commission on Youth; review and report on the use of seclusion and restraint in schools. Requires the Virginia Commission on Youth, in consultation with the Department of Education and the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, to review (i) statewide policies and regulations on the use of seclusion and restraint in public and private elementary and secondary schools and (ii) methods used in other states to reduce and eliminate the use of seclusion and restraint in public and private elementary and secondary schools. The bill requires the Commission to make recommendations for the modernization of Virginia's policies and regulations on the use of seclusion and restraint in schools and submit its recommendations no later than November 30, 2014, to the General Assembly. The Virginia Commission on Youth shall report its findings to the Governor and the 2015 Regular Session of the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Commission on Youth; shall review use of seclusion and restraint in schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request for second conference committee (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (43-Y 56-N) (Y: 44 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-07 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
2014-04-07 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 770 (effective 7/1/14)
2014-03-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2014-03-17SenateSigned by President
2014-03-17HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1106ER)
2014-03-17HouseEnrolled
2014-03-08SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2014-03-08HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
2014-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
2014-03-08HouseSecond Conference substitute printed 14105656D-H3
2014-03-07HouseDelegates: Hope, Bell, R.P., Peace
2014-03-07HouseSecond conferees appointed by House
2014-03-07SenateSenators: Marsden, Locke, Vogel
2014-03-07SenateSecond conferees appointed by Senate
2014-03-07SenateSenate acceded to request for second conference committee (39-Y 0-N)
2014-03-07HouseHouse requested second conference committee
2014-03-07HouseMotion for second committee of conference agreed to
2014-03-07HouseVOTE: REJECTED (43-Y 56-N)
2014-03-07HouseConference report rejected by House (43-Y 56-N)
2014-03-07HouseFirst Conference substitute printed 14105592D-H2
2014-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2014-03-05SenateSenators: Deeds, Lucas, Watkins
2014-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2014-03-05HouseDelegates: Hope, Bell, R.P., Peace
2014-03-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2014-03-04HouseHouse acceded to request
2014-03-03SenateSenate requested conference committee
2014-03-03SenateSenate insisted on substitute (38-Y 1-N)
2014-02-27HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N)
2014-02-27HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 14105144D-S1 (0-Y 98-N)
2014-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar
2014-02-25SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2014-02-25SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1106S1
2014-02-25SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 14105144D-S1
2014-02-25SenateReading of substitute waived
2014-02-25SenateRead third time
2014-02-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2014-02-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 14105144D-S1
2014-02-21SenateReported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2014-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2014-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2014-02-11HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2014-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
2014-02-10HousePrinted as engrossed 14104420D-EH1
2014-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1106EH1
2014-02-10HouseAmendments by Delegate Hope agreed to
2014-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 14104420D-H1
2014-02-10HouseRead second time
2014-02-07HousePassed by for the day
2014-02-06HouseRead first time
2014-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 14104420D-H1
2014-02-05HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2014-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
2014-01-31HouseAssigned Education sub: Education Reform
2014-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2014-01-28HouseReferred from General Laws by voice vote
2014-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2014-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 14103596D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB1106
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1106+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1106H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1106EH1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1106S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1106H2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1106H3+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1106ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+CHAP0770+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+H0903V0039+HB1106
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+H09V0094+HB1106
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+HV0686+HB1106
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+S10V0101+HB1106
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+SV0518HB1106+HB1106
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+SV0538HB1106+HB1106
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+HV1165+HB1106
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+SV0696HB1106+HB1106
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+HV1412+HB1106
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+SV0880HB1106+HB1106
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+HV1437+HB1106
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+SV0903HB1106+HB1106

Bill Comments 750

feedback