VA HB1099 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Military Survivors and Dependents Education Program; eligibility. Extends the benefits of the Virginia Military Survivors and Dependents Education Program to the spouse or child of a veteran with at least a 90 percent permanent, service-related disability. Under current law, the spouse or child would be eligible for benefits only if the veteran's disability was incurred during military operations against terrorism, on a peacekeeping mission, as a result of a terrorist act, or in any armed conflict. The bill also requires the Department of Veterans Services to define "armed conflict" pursuant to regulation. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a 2016 general appropriation act.
Title
Virginia Military Survivors and Dependents Education Program; eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote |
2016-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102770D |