VA HB1090 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Medicaid eligibility; determination of assets. Provides that for the purpose of determining eligibility for medical assistance, the sale or transfer of real property at a price that is less than the assessed value of the property shall be considered an uncompensated transfer of assets equal to the amount of the difference between the assessed value of the property and the amount received from the sale or transfer, except that any sale or transfer of real property at a price that is less than the assessed value of the property shall not be considered an uncompensated transfer of assets if the price at which the property is sold or transferred is equal to or greater than the value of the property as determined by a good-faith appraisal or is a fair market price for the property in an arm's length transaction.
Title
Medicaid eligibility; determination of assets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-20 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-06 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-03 | House: Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources | |
2012-02-02 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-02 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104863D-H1 | |
2012-02-02 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101988D |