VA HB1083 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-31 - Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Feb 24 @ 8:00 am in Senate Room A Pocahontas Building
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing access to firearms by minors; penalty. Provides that any person who recklessly leaves a loaded, unsecured firearm in such a manner as to endanger the life or limb of any person under the age of 18 is guilty of a Class 6 felony. Current law provides that any person who recklessly leaves a loaded, unsecured firearm in such a manner as to endanger the life or limb of any child under the age of 14 is guilty of a Class 3 misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minors; allowing access to firearms, Class 6 felony.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-30HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N)
2020-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 46-N)
2020-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1083H1
2020-01-29HousePending question ordered
2020-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106627D-H1
2020-01-29HousePassed by temporarily
2020-01-29HouseRead second time
2020-01-28HouseRead first time
2020-01-24HouseIncorporates HB72 (Kory)
2020-01-24HouseIncorporates HB463 (Hayes)
2020-01-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106627D-H1
2020-01-24HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102956D

Same As/Similar To

HB463 (Similar To) 2020-01-24 - Incorporated by Public Safety
HB72 (Similar To) 2020-01-24 - Incorporated by Public Safety

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18256.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback