VA HB1080 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0316)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0316)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sex offenders in emergency shelters; notification registration. Provides that a registered sex offender who enters an emergency shelter designated by the Commonwealth or any political subdivision thereof and operated in response to a declared state or local emergency shall, as soon as practicable after entry, notify a member of the shelter's staff who is responsible for providing security of such person's status as a registered sex offender. This bill provides that no person shall be denied entry solely on the basis of his status as a sex offender unless such entry is otherwise prohibited by law. The bill requires that the Department of State Police provide to any registered sex offender at the time of his initial registration a summary of his obligation to inform the staff of an emergency shelter of his status as a registered sex offender. Sex offenders in emergency shelters; notification registration. Provides that a registered sex offender who enters an emergency shelter designated by the Commonwealth or any political subdivision thereof and operated in response to a declared state or local emergency shall, as soon as practicable after entry, notify a member of the shelter's staff who is responsible for providing security of such person's status as a registered sex offender. This bill provides that no person shall be denied entry solely on the basis of his status as a sex offender unless such entry is otherwise prohibited by law. The bill requires that the Department of State Police provide to any registered sex offender at the time of his initial registration a summary of his obligation to inform the staff of an emergency shelter of his status as a registered sex offender.
Title
Sex offenders in emergency shelters; notification, registration, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (77-Y 22-N) (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0316) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 316 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1080ER) |
2022-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-25 | House | VOTE: Adoption (77-Y 22-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22106764D-S1 (77-Y 22-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1080S1 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106764D-S1 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106764D-S1 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Printed as engrossed 22101582D-E |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1080E |
2022-02-14 | House | Amendment by Delegate Leftwich agreed to |
2022-02-14 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101582D |