VA HB108 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Shared solar programs; American Electric Power; minimum bill; capacity. Requires the State Corporation Commission to establish by regulation a shared solar program, as defined in the bill, through which customers of American Electric Power may purchase electric power through a subscription in a shared solar facility, as defined in the bill. The bill requires the Commission to establish a minimum bill, which shall include the costs of all utility infrastructure and services used to provide electric service and administrative costs of the shared solar program, taking into account certain considerations. The bill directs the Commission to initiate a proceeding to recalculate such minimum bill within 30 days of its final order in a proceeding establishing the value of a solar renewable energy certificate as required by relevant law. The bill specifies that the Commission shall establish the shared solar program consistent with the requirements of the bill by January 1, 2025, and shall require each utility to file any associated tariffs, agreements, or forms necessary for implementing the program by July 1, 2025. Additionally, the bill requires the Department of Energy to convene a stakeholder work group to determine the amounts and forms of certain project incentives and to submit a written report to the Chairs of the House Committee on Labor and Commerce and the Senate Committee on Commerce and Labor no later than November 30, 2024.
Title
Shared solar programs; SCC to establish by regulation, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Richard Sullivan [D] | Del. Elizabeth Bennett-Parker [D] | Del. Katrina Callsen [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] |
Del. Irene Shin [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 716 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB108ER) |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-04 | House | VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 46-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (52-Y 46-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 17-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (10-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB108H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107302D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107302D-H1 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2024-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101046D |
Same As/Similar To
SB255 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0765)
Subjects
Public Service Companies
Solar Energy
State Corporation Commission
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Solar Energy
State Corporation Commission
Study Commissions Committees and Reports