VA HB1078 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1158)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1158)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; process for competitive negotiation; including employment of persons with a disability as a factor in evaluating proposals. Provides that, except with regard to contracts for architectural, professional engineering, transportation construction, or transportation-related construction services, a public body may include a proposer's employment of persons with disabilities to perform the specifications of the contract as a factor in evaluating a proposal.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; process for competitive negotiation, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 43-N) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1158) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1158 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1078ER) |
2020-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 43-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (53-Y 43-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 20104594D-E |
2020-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1078E |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (13-Y 8-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104594D |