VA HB1074 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1074
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Continued to 2023 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Continued to 2023 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Rabies vaccination; titer test; certification. Directs the Board of Health to develop, by regulation, an exemption to the rabies vaccination requirement for animals if a licensed veterinarian certifies in writing that the vaccine would endanger the animal based on an underlying medical factor and a titer test indicates a sufficient level of immunity to rabies. The bill provides that such certification is valid for a period of one year and serves as proof of vaccination.
Title
Rabies vaccination; titer test, certification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | House | Continued to 2023 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2023 by voice vote |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102516D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1074 (Carry Over) 2022-02-02 - Continued to 2023 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote