VA HB1072 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Emissions inspections. Privatizes services now provided by the Department of Environmental Quality related to vehicle emissions inspections. The bill also updates authorized testing equipment, allows use of wireless systems to increase convenience, and replaces program validation required by the Clean Air Act with randomly assigned free emissions tests performed when vehicles undergo state safety inspection. Savings generated are dedicated to transportation maintenance projects. The bill removes language related to emissions testing in the Richmond area and establishes an enhanced emissions inspection program for areas other than Northern Virginia. Surplus funds from the program are dedicated to transportation maintenance in those localities required to have basic emissions inspections.
Title
Motor vehicle emissions inspections; privatizes services now provided by DEQ, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Transportation | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-24 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: Special Subcommittee | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101362D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1176 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1177.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1178 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1178.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1179.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1182.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1187.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1187.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB1072 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB1072+hil |