VA HB1056 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1036)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1036)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commission on Wellness and Opportunity established. Creates the 23-member Commission on Wellness and Opportunity in the legislative branch to study and make recommendations relating to establishing the mission and vision of what health and wellness means for Virginia by examining various dimensions of health and wellness, including but not limited to physical, intellectual, emotional, spiritual, environmental, and social wellness, and utilizing the comprehensive theoretical framework of "the social determinants of health"; identifying and defining measurable opportunities and outcomes that build community competence around well-being; and making policy recommendations for improving the quality of life for the people of the Commonwealth. The Commission shall meet at least quarterly. The bill provides that the Commission will sunset on July 1, 2025.
Title
Wellness and Opportunity, Commission on; established, report.
Sponsors
Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (64-Y 29-N) (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request for second conference committee (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 20-N) (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (64-Y 29-N) (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request for second conference committee (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 20-N) (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1036) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1036 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1056ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 3-N) |
2020-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (64-Y 29-N) |
2020-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (64-Y 29-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | Delegates: Adams, D.M., Rasoul, Davis |
2020-03-07 | House | Second conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senators: Favola, Boysko, Vogel |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Second conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate acceded to request for second conference committee (37-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | House requested second conference committee |
2020-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 41-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (58-Y 41-N) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested second conference committee (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Adams, D.M., Rasoul, Davis |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Favola, Boysko, Vogel |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 97-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (77-Y 20-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (77-Y 20-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103312D |