VA HB1053 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0314)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0314)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Destruction and disposal of abandoned watercraft by localities and state agencies. Allows localities and state agencies to apply, under certain conditions, to the Department of Wildlife Resources for an authorization to destroy and dispose of an abandoned watercraft.
Title
Abandoned watercraft; destruction and disposal by localities and state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0314) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 314 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1053ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102298D |