VA HB1053 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1053
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Local correctional facilities; fees. Directs the State Board of Local and Regional Jails (the Board) to convene a work group to study implementation of the reduction or elimination of certain fees associated with inmates in local correctional facilities. The bill provides that the work group shall consist of two members of the House Committee on Public Safety who are not members of the same political party and two members of the Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services who are not members of the same political party. Such legislative members shall appoint as members of the work group one formerly incarcerated person, one family member of an incarcerated person, and at least one representative of certain organizations and companies. The bill directs the Board to report its findings to the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services and the House Committee on Public Safety by October 1, 2022.
Title
Correctional facilities, local; fees associated with inmates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455 |
2022-03-11 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | Conference substitute printed 22107748D-H2 |
2022-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-07 | House | Delegates: Shin, Wilt, Batten |
2022-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senators: Morrissey, Boysko, Reeves |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22106689D-S1 (0-Y 98-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (28-Y 12-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1053S1 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106689D-S1 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106689D-S1 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (10-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1053H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105668D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105668D-H1 |
2022-02-04 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102508D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1053 (Carry Over) 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Correctional Enterprises
Inmates
Jails and Prisons
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Correctional Enterprises
Inmates
Jails and Prisons
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 1 | 1.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 127.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 127.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 127.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 127.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 131 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 131.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 131.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |