VA HB1053 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voting systems; voter-verifiable paper record. Requires any electronic voting system approved by the State Board of Elections to retain each printed ballot cast. Printed ballots are currently defined to include machine-readable ballots, and the bill amends the definition of a machine-readable ballot to mean a tangible ballot that is marked by a voter or by a system or device operated by voter, is available for verification by the voter at the time the ballot is cast, and is then fed into and scanned by a separate counting machine. The bill amends the requirements for sealing and delivering ballots after an election to include printed ballots; current law only addresses paper ballots.
Title
Voting systems; voter-verifiable paper record.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 294 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1053ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1053H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107096D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107096D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Gubernatorial Appointments |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104039D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 629 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 668 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 669 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |