VA HB1044 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0488)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

School board policies; healthy school workplaces. Requires each school board to adopt policies to (i) prohibit abusive work environments in the school division, (ii) provide for the appropriate discipline of any school board employee who contributes to an abusive work environment, and (iii) prohibit retaliation or reprisal against a school board employee who alleges an abusive work environment or assists in the investigation of an allegation of an abusive work environment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School board; policies prohibiting abusive work environment, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 36-N) (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 39-N) (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0488)
2018-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 488 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-09HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1044ER)
2018-03-09HouseEnrolled
2018-03-07HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 36-N)
2018-03-07HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 18107728D-S1 (62-Y 36-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N)
2018-03-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1044S1
2018-03-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107728D-S1
2018-03-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2018-03-01SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107728D-S1
2018-03-01SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
2018-02-21SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 39-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (61-Y 39-N)
2018-02-12HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-09HouseRead first time
2018-02-07HouseReported from Education (15-Y 7-N)
2018-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100488D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221314.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221314.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1044
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1044+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1044S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1044ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0488+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0902V0037+HB1044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H09V0075+HB1044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0719+HB1044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0295+HB1044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0862HB1044+HB1044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0917HB1044+HB1044
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1447+HB1044

Bill Comments

feedback