VA HB1043 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; coverage for autism spectrum disorder; individual and small group markets. Eliminates the exemption from the requirements to provide coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorder for insurers, corporations, and organizations issuing policies, contracts, and plans in the individual and small group markets. Under current law, only policies, contracts, and plans issued in the large group market are required to provide such coverage.
Title
Health insurance; coverage for autism spectrum disorder, individual and small group markets.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Incorporated by Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1503-Ward) by voice vote |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102333D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1503 (Similar To) 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1043 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1043+hil |