VA HB1040 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1040

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Continued to 2021 with substitute in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Naturopathic doctors; license required. Requires the Board of Medicine to license and regulate naturopathic doctors, defined in the bill as an individual, other than a doctor of medicine, osteopathy, chiropractic, or podiatry, who may diagnose, treat, and help prevent diseases using a system of practice that is based on the natural healing capacity of individuals, using physiological, psychological, or physical methods, and who may also use natural medicines, prescriptions, legend drugs, foods, herbs, or other natural remedies, including light and air.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Naturopathic doctors; Board of Medicine to license and regulate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House: Continued to 2021 with substitute in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 7-N) (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30HouseContinued to 2021 with substitute in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 7-N)
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health Professions
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104929D

Same As/Similar To

HB1040 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Continued to 2021 with substitute in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 7-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412900(n/a)See Bill Text
5412901(n/a)See Bill Text
5412914(n/a)See Bill Text
5412956.14(n/a)See Bill Text
5412956.17(n/a)See Bill Text
5412973.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5413401(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback