VA HB104 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0084)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0084)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Divorce; service of process; failure to respond. Provides that if a defendant fails to file an answer in a divorce suit or otherwise appear after having been personally served with notice of the suit, no additional notice to take depositions is required to be served on the defendant and the court may enter any order or final decree without notice to the defendant. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference.
Title
Divorce; failure to respond by defendant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0084) | |
2012-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 84 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-21 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB104ER) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-17 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-01 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-30 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2011-12-29 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-12-29 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100274D |
Same As/Similar To
SB60 (Same As) 2012-03-06 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 78 (effective 7/1/12)