VA HB1029 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-07 - Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-07 - Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Libel and slander; candidates for office. Creates a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person to use campaign funds for the purpose of knowingly and falsely asserting criminal behavior on the part of a candidate.
Title
Libel and slander; candidates for office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | House | Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2014-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102118D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB1029 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1029+hil |