VA HB1029 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - House: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (36-Y 61-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - House: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (36-Y 61-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Requirement that certain planning commissioners own real property. Removes the requirement that at least one-half of the members of a local planning commission be owners of real property.
Title
Real property; removes requirement that certain planning commissioners own.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (36-Y 61-N) (Y: 36 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | House: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (36-Y 61-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossment refused by House (36-Y 61-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 8-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101144D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Property and Conveyances
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Property and Conveyances
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax