VA HB1018 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Appellate proceedings; audio and audio-visual records; circuit court opinions; fees; access. Requires the appellate courts to produce audio or audio-visual recordings of oral arguments and to make such recordings available to the public without charge. The bill also clarifies that clerks are not required to charge fees for access to or copies of orders and opinions and, further, that a clerk may not restrict redistribution of publicly accessible court records. The bill contains a delayed effective date.
Title
Appellate proceedings; audio and audio-visual records, circuit court opinions, fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102001D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 275 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 293 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 293.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB1018 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1018+hil |