VA HB1007 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation
Pending: House Communications, Technology and Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation
Pending: House Communications, Technology and Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Chief Information Officer; transition of web-based services for executive branch agencies to cloud-based server solutions. Requires the Chief Information Officer of the Commonwealth, on or before December 1, 2020, to submit to the Governor and the Chairman of the Joint Commission on Technology and Science a plan providing for the transition of web-based tier one services used by executive branch agencies, with some exceptions, from state servers to cloud-based or hybrid server solutions by July 1, 2022.
Title
CIO; transition of web-based services for executive branch agencies to cloud-based server solutions.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Technology and Innovation |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103156D |