VA HB1007 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Delegate Lacey E. Putney Memorial Highway. Designates the portion of U.S. Route 221 between the Town of Bedford and the City of Lynchburg the "Delegate Lacey E. Putney Memorial Highway." The bill contains an emergency clause. This bill is identical to SB 363.
Title
Delegate Lacey E. Putney Memorial Highway; designating certain portion of U.S. Route 221.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008) | |
2018-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 8 (effective 2/19/18) | |
2018-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2018 | |
2018-02-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/15/18 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1007ER) |
2018-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-29 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | House | Printed as engrossed 18101122D-E |
2018-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1007E |
2018-01-26 | House | Amendments by Delegate Byron agreed to |
2018-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-23 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/10/18 18101122D |