VA HB1007 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; Department of Motor Vehicles. Provides for cooperation between the Department of Motor Vehicles and the State Board of Elections in the prompt transmittal of voter registration applications and change of address information from DMV offices to SBE and the general registrars.
Title
Voter registration; DMV to transmit voter registration applications to State Board of Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662) | |
2012-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 662 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1007ER) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102048D |