VA HB1007 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792)
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792)
Summary
Virginia Fusion Intelligence Center; confidentiality; immunity. Provides that papers, records, documents, reports, materials, databases or other evidence or information relative to criminal intelligence or any terrorism investigation in the possession of the Virginia Fusion Intelligence Center within the Department of State Police is confidential and not subject to the Virginia Freedom of Information Act or the Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act. The Department must conduct an annual review of such information and remove any which is determined to not have a nexus to terroristic activity. The bill also provides that people who have access to information maintained by the Fusion Center are not subject to subpoena in any civil action concerning criminal intelligence information maintained by the Fusion Center. The bill restricts the release or dissemination of information without prior authorization from the Fusion Center and punishes any person who knowingly disseminates information with a Class 1 misdemeanor. If such unauthorized release or dissemination results in death or serious bodily injury the penalty is a Class 4 felony. There is an immunity provision for people who furnish information on criminal violations to a governmental entity established for the purposes of detecting and preventing acts of terrorism.
Title
Fusion Intelligence Center; confidentiality and immunity from service of process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 792 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1007ER) | |
2008-03-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-03-08 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-08 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Delegates: Jones, D.C., Janis, Lingamfelter | |
2008-03-06 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senators: Reynolds, Hurt, Stolle | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-03-06 | House: House acceded to request | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute rejected by House (1-Y 98-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1007S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 081575580-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 081575580-S1 | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Printed as engrossed 084636824-E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1007E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 2-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-08 | House: Referred from Appropriations by voice vote | |
2008-02-01 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-01 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084636824 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1007 |