VA HB100 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]


Method of execution; lethal injection drugs. Eliminates the provision making the identities of (i) any pharmacy or outsourcing facility that enters into a contract with the Department of Corrections for the compounding of drugs necessary to carry out an execution by lethal injection, (ii) any officer or employee of such pharmacy or outsourcing facility, and (iii) any person or entity used by such pharmacy or outsourcing facility to facilitate the compounding of such drugs confidential, exempt from the Freedom of Information Act (? 2.2-3700 et seq.), and not subject to discovery or introduction as evidence in any civil proceeding unless good cause is shown.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Method of execution; lethal injection drugs.


Roll Calls

2018-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-02-15HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2018-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
2018-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-12-13HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-12-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101192D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531234(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments