UT HB0321 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Eviction Records Amendments
Title
Eviction Records Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-14 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-14 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-06 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-06 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Business and Labor Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Business and Labor Committee |
2024-01-28 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-18 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |