US SR95 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution designating March 22, 2017, as "National Rehabilitation Counselors Appreciation Day". Designates March 22, 2017, as National Rehabilitation Counselors Appreciation Day. Commends rehabilitation counselors and professional organizations assisting individuals who require rehabilitation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution designating March 22, 2017, as "National Rehabilitation Counselors Appreciation Day".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2051)
2017-03-23SenateReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1978-1979)

Same As/Similar To

SR447 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1978; text: CR S1954)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback