US SR92 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1206; text as passed Senate: CR S1203-1204)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1206; text as passed Senate: CR S1203-1204)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating February 28, 2015, as "Rare Disease Day". Designates February 28, 2015, as Rare Disease Day. Expresses support for a national and global commitment to developing new treatments, diagnostics, and cures for rare diseases and disorders.
Title
A resolution designating February 28, 2015, as "Rare Disease Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1206; text as passed Senate: CR S1203-1204) |
Same As/Similar To
HR109 (Related) 2015-02-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB627 (Related) 2015-05-15 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
SR380 (Related) 2016-03-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
HB627 (Related) 2015-05-15 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
SR380 (Related) 2016-03-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Hereditary and development disorders
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
World health
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Hereditary and development disorders
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-resolution/92/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/sres92/BILLS-114sres92ats.pdf |