US SR88 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1606; text: CR S1603)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1606; text: CR S1603)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates March 1, 2019, as Read Across America Day. The resolution (1) honors all authors for their successes in encouraging children to discover the joy of reading; (2) honors the 22nd anniversary of Read Across America Day; and (3) encourages parents, educators, and communities to read with their children for at least 30 minutes on Read Across America Day.
Title
A resolution designating March 1, 2019, as "Read Across America Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1606; text: CR S1603) |
Same As/Similar To
SR512 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1236; text: CR S1228)
HR878 (Related) 2020-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR878 (Related) 2020-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
Art, artists, authorship
Books and print media
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Language arts
Books and print media
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Language arts
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/88/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres88/BILLS-116sres88ats.pdf |