US SR87 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-21 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2163)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-21 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2163)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates April 4, 2013, as National Association of Junior Auxiliaries Day.
Title
A resolution designating April 4, 2013, as "National Association of Junior Auxiliaries Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Mark Pryor [D-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2163) |
Same As/Similar To
SR93 (Same As) 2013-04-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2474; text as passed Senate: CR S2457-2458)
SR406 (Related) 2014-03-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1880; text as passed Senate: CR S1873)
SR406 (Related) 2014-03-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1880; text as passed Senate: CR S1873)
Subjects
Child safety and welfare
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Social welfare
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Social welfare
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-resolution/87/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/sres87/BILLS-113sres87is.pdf |