US SR87 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4522; text as passed Senate: CR S4522)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4522; text as passed Senate: CR S4522)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commends public servants for their outstanding contributions to the nation during Public Service Recognition Week and throughout the year.Honors government employees who have given their lives in service to their country.Encourages efforts to promote public service careers.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that public servants should be commended for their dedication and continued service to the Nation during Public Service Recognition Week, May 4 through 10, 2009.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Akaka [D-HI] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Carl Levin [D-MI] |
Sen. Joseph Lieberman [I-CT] | Sen. George Voinovich [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4522; text as passed Senate: CR S4522) | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 48. | |
2009-04-20 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. | |
2009-04-01 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3933) | |
2009-03-26 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3933) |
Same As/Similar To
HR299 (Related) 2009-05-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1247 (Related) 2010-05-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR481 (Same As) 2010-04-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2983)
HR1247 (Related) 2010-05-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR481 (Same As) 2010-04-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2983)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Congressional tributes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics