US SR76 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1044; text: 02/16/2023 CR S464)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1044; text: 02/16/2023 CR S464)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing deepest condolences to and solidarity with the people of Turkiye and Syria following the devastating earthquake on February 6, 2023.
Title
A resolution expressing deepest condolences to and solidarity with the people of Turkiye and Syria following the devastating earthquake on February 6, 2023.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1044; text: 02/16/2023 CR S464) |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |